SC H3662 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

To The Extent Of Their Contents, As The Only General Permanent Statutory Law Of The State As Of January 1, 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption of Revised Code Volumes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 63
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 83
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-24SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-01-22HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
2019-01-22HouseRead second time
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback