SC H3785 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Oakley Road In Berkeley County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 52 To Its Intersection With Old Fort Road "dr. Tonia Aiken Taylor Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Dr. Tonia Aiken Taylor Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Rep. JA Moore [D] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] |
Rep. Krystle Matthews [D] | Rep. Marvin Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Concurred in amendment |
2021-03-17 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-18-21 |
2021-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced |