SC H3989 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 33, Title 58 So As To Establish The "solar, Agricultural, Farmland, And Environmental Act"; To Provide For Definitions; To Establish Certificate Requirements For Construction Of Photovoltaic Energy Facilities; To Establish The Certificate Application Process; To Provide Requirements For Hearings Regarding The Certificate Application; To Establish The Parties To A Certification Proceeding; To Require A Record Of The Proceedings And To Permit The Public Service Commission To Consolidate The Representation Of Parties With Similar Interests; To Establish Requirements For The Public Service Commission's Decision Regarding An Application; To Require The Public Service Commission To Issue An Order Within One Hundred Eighty Days From The Date The Application Is Filed; To Provide For Payment Of Costs For The Office Of Regulatory Staff And The Public Service Commission For A Filed Application; And To Create The Agricultural And Farmland Viability Protection Fund.
Title
Solar, Agricultural, Farmland and Environmental Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Mon., 3/18/24 |
2024-02-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Mon., 2/19/24 |
2024-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Calhoon |
2024-01-23 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-6-24 |
2024-01-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-23-24 |
2024-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler |
2024-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson |
2023-05-11 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-9-24 |
2023-05-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-11-23 |
2023-05-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bauer, Forrest |
2023-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-10-23 |
2023-05-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams, Henegan |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |