SC H4004 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Enable Certain Persons To Execute A Post Form Signed By A Physician That Sets Forth The Patient's Wishes As To Health Care Where The Patient Has Been Diagnosed With A Serious Illness Or May Be Expected To Lose Capacity Within Twelve Months; To Require Health Care Providers And Health Care Facilities To Accept A Post Form As A Valid Medical Order And To Comply With The Order, With Exceptions; To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Perform Certain Duties With Respect To Overseeing Post Forms And To Promulgate Regulations; To Provide Immunity From Civil And Criminal Liability And From Disciplinary Action For Certain Persons Acting In Accordance With Provisions Of The Chapter; To Allow A Post Form To Be Revoked By The Patient Or Patient's Legal Representative; And For Other Purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Orders for Scope of Treatment (POST) Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Act No. 89
2019-06-10 Effective date 5/24/19
2019-05-24 Signed By Governor
2019-05-22 Ratified R 112
2019-05-21HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateConference report received and adopted
2019-05-20HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2019-05-20HouseConference report adopted
2019-05-09HouseConference committee appointed Ridgeway, Herbkersman, Clary
2019-05-09SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Davis, Gambrell, Kimpson
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-109
2019-05-09HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2019-04-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-3
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-09HouseAmended
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore
2019-04-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-04-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
2019-03-07HouseCommitted to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-03-07HouseRecalled from Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4004&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190404.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190405.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190409.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190410.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4004_20190521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16316
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16660
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16814
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16869
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16874

Bill Comments

feedback