SC H4217 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 7-7-110, Relating To Designation Of Voting Precincts In Beaufort County, So As To Revise The Names Of Certain Precincts, Add New Precincts, Remove Precincts, And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which These Precincts May Be Found On File With The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title
Title
Beaufort County Voting Precincts
Sponsors
Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. William Herbkersman [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] |
Rep. Bill Hager [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Act No. 82 | |
2023-06-26 | Effective date 01/01/24 | |
2023-06-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-06-14 | Ratified R 101 | |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-04-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2023-04-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2023-04-27 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended |
2023-04-26 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Beaufort Delegation |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Beaufort Delegation |
2023-03-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |