SC H4304 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Gressette Room 308
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Gressette Room 308
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 15-75-30 So As To Permit Parental And Filial Consortium Claims.
Title
Torts, loss of parental and filial consortium claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |