SC H4380 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The Public Service Commission Shall Order Refunds To Ratepayers Of Amounts Collected For Costs Attributed To Projects Constructed Under The Provisions Of The Base Load Review Act In Specific Circumstances; To Provide Utilities Bear The Burden Of Proving That Collected Costs May Be Recoverable Under State Law; And To Provide The Commission Shall Order Such Refunds On Just And Reasonable Bases And May Make Such Refunds By Establishing Credits To Ratepayers Over Periods Of Time And Under Conditions That Are Just And Reasonable.
Title
Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-4-18 |
2018-03-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-6-18 |
2018-02-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-1-18 |
2018-02-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-28-18 |
2018-02-14 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-15-18 |
2018-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2018-02-01 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-01-30 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 1-31-18 |
2018-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson |
2018-01-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-30-18 |
2018-01-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 1-25-18 |
2018-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Weeks |
2018-01-16 | House | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, January 17, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-11-09 | House | Prefiled |