SC H4456 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Alpine Road In Richland County From Its Intersection With Polo Road To Its Intersection With Jackson Creek "jacqualine Kasprowski Way" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Jacqualine Kasprowski Way in Richland County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-05-02 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced |