SC H4485 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 307
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 307
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO AUTHORIZE THE STATE BUDGET AND CONTROL BOARD TO TRANSFER OWNERSHIP OF SUMMERVILLE NATIONAL GUARD ARMORY IN SUMMERVILLE, SOUTH CAROLINA, TO THE TOWN OF SUMMERVILLE. - ratified title
Title
Authorize The State Budget And Control Board To Transfer Ownership Of Summerville National Guard Armory In Summerville, South Carolina, To The Town Of Summerville. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 307 | |
2010-04-12 | Effective date 04/01/10 | |
2010-04-01 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2010-03-25 | Ratified R 164 | |
2010-03-09 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-17 | |
2010-03-04 | Read second time SJ-11 | |
2010-03-03 | Committee report: Favorable Finance SJ-15 | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-11 | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced and read first time SJ-11 | |
2010-02-04 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-29 | |
2010-02-03 | Read second time HJ-12 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-49 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4485&session=118 |