SC H4617 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 44-53-230, Relating To Schedule Iii Controlled Substances, So As To Add Xylazine As A Schedule Iii Controlled Substance, With Exceptions; And By Adding Section 44-53-372 So As To Prohibit The Production, Manufacture, Distribution, Or Possession Of Xylazine, With Exceptions, And To Establish Associated Criminal Penalties.
Title
Xylazine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-01-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-01-11 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-01-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2024-01-11 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Caskey, Ligon, Vaughan |
2024-01-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robbins, Felder |
2024-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kilmartin |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0849 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs