SC H4655 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Gressette Room 207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Gressette Room 207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 59-10-10, Relating To Standards For Physical Activity And Physical Education In Kindergarten Through Eighth Grade, So As To Require Certain Mandatory Minimum Periods For Physical Education And Recess In Four-year-old Kindergarten Through Eighth Grade Each Year In Addition To Other Curriculum Requirements, And To Provide Recess Periods Must Be Held Indoors During Times Of Inclement Weather; To Redesignate Article 1 Of Chapter 10, Title 59 As "physical Education And Activity"; To Provide The State Board Of Education And State Department Of Education Shall Take Certain Measures To Conform Their Respective Regulations And Rules To The Provisions Of This Act; And To Clarify That The Provisions Of This Act Prevail To The Extent They Conflict With Any Such Regulations And Rules.
Title
Unstructured and self-directed recess in public schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2024-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-20 | House | Debate interrupted |
2024-03-20 | House | Amended |
2024-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel, Rivers |
2024-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2024-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers, Hart, King, Williams, Henegan |
2024-03-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2024-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins |
2024-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter, J.L.Johnson |
2024-01-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-12-14 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0516 (Similar To) 2023-02-09 - Referred to Committee on Education
H3292 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3731 (Similar To) 2023-02-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3292 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3731 (Similar To) 2023-02-07 - Scrivener's error corrected