SC H4787 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 301
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 301
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, Relating To Horse Meat And Kangaroo Meat; Fairs, Camp Meetings, And Other Gatherings; Camps; Mobile/manufactured Home Parks; Sanitation Of Schools; And Nuisances, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4552, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code
Title
Horse meat and kangaroo meat (D. No. 4552)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 301 | |
2016-03-22 | Effective date 03/16/16 | |
2016-03-16 | Became law without Governor's signature | |
2016-03-10 | Ratified R 152 | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |