SC H4833 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Place Appropriate Markers Or Signs At The State-maintained Road Entrances To The Town Of Slater-marrietta In Greenville County Containing The Words "home Of The Slater-marietta High School Green Wave Five-time South Carolina Boys State Basketball Champions: 1953, 1962, 1964, 1966, And 1971".
Title
Slater-Marietta High School State Championships Commemorative Signs
Sponsors
Rep. James Burns [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-30 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2024-01-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced |