SC H5073 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-4-14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-28 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-4-14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete Language Providing That The Attorney General Is The Chief Prosecuting Officer Of The State With Authority To Supervise The Prosecution Of All Criminal Cases In Courts Of Record.
Title
Constitutional officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-4-14 |
2014-05-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-28-14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-27-14 |
2014-05-13 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-14-14 |
2014-05-07 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Southard |
2014-04-30 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-6-14 |
2014-04-30 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Sabb, Taylor, Gagnon |
2014-04-29 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Bowers, Rivers, Parks, G.A.Brown |
2014-04-29 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2014-04-29 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Chumley, Atwater, J.R.Smith, Owens, McCoy, R.L.Brown, Hodges, Douglas, King, Mack, Anthony, Alexander, Gilliard, Jefferson, Branham, Ridgeway, George |
2014-04-10 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Simrill, J.E.Smith, Rutherford, R.L.Ott, Sellers, Funderburk, Spires, Norrell, Cobb-Hunter, Robinson-Simpson, Howard, Dillard, McEachern, Neal, Huggins, Cole, Allison, Bedingfield, Forrester, Putnam, Edge, Hiott, Willis, Skelton, Newton |
2014-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Murphy |
2014-04-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |