SC H5236 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 44-6-50, Relating To Responsibilities Of The Department Of Health And Human Services Or A Successor Agency, So As To Make Certain Changes Concerning Medicaid Claims Processing Contracts.
Title
Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2024-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |