SC H5246 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services
Pending: Senate Family and Veterans Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 1-1-612 So As To Provide That The Black Skimmer Is The Official Seabird Of The State.
Title
State seabird
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2024-04-23 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-17 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |