SC S0112 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 516
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 516
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 34-11-90, Relating To Jurisdiction For Offenses Involving Checks And Penalties, So As To Provide A Method To Expunge Convictions; And To Amend Section 17-22-910, As Amended, Relating To Applications For Expungement, So As To Add Multiple Misdemeanor Offenses Of Check Fraud To Those Offenses Eligible For Expungement.
Title
Fraudulent Check Expungement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Matthews, Rice, Senn, Adams |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2023-02-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |