SC S0207 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 57-23-1160 So As To Create The Piedmont Gateway Scenic Byway And To Identify The Three Segments That Comprise The Byway.
Title
Piedmont Gateway Scenic Byway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-03-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4101 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works