SC S0314 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allow A Deduction For Certain Rotations For Which No Income Tax Credit Is Available

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 45
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 65
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-8
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseAmended
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-02-12SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-2
2019-02-12SenateRead second time
2019-02-07 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-06SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2019-01-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1261140(n/a)See Bill Text
1263800(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback