SC S0323 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Allow The Department Of Revenue To Submit Certain Information To A Financial Institution Regarding A Debtor That Has Been Named On A Warrant For Distraint, And To Require The Financial Institution Provide Certain Information To The Department

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOR; allow DOR to submit certain information to a financial institution regarding a debtor that has been named on a warrant for distraint

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 46
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 66
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-1
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-20HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-19SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-02-14SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-02-14SenateRead second time
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1254265(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback