SC S0363 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Act No. 24
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 56-5-4445, Relating To Restrictions On Elevating Or Lowering Motor Vehicles, So As To Make Technical Changes, To Prohibit Motor Vehicle Modifications That Result In The Motor Vehicles' Front Fenders Being Raised Or Lowered Four Or More Inches Greater Than The Height Of The Rear Fenders, To Provide For The Manner Of Measuring The Height Of The Fenders, To Define The Term "fender", And To Provide Penalties For Violations. - Ratified Title
Title
Carolina Squat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Act No. 24 | |
2023-05-25 | Effective date 11/12/23 | |
2023-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-11 | Ratified R 31 | |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2023-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-03 | House | Amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-01-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3137 (Similar To) 2023-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
H3411 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3414 (Similar To) 2023-04-05 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3411 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3414 (Similar To) 2023-04-05 - Scrivener's error corrected