SC S0445 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read third time and enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read third time and enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 2 To Chapter 49, Title 44 So As To Require The Department Of Alcohol And Other Drug Abuse Services To Approve A Credentialing Entity To Develop And Administer A Voluntary Certification Program For Recovery Housing; To Require The Approved Credentialing Entity To Establish Recovery Housing Certification Requirements And Procedures Based Upon Nationally Recognized Quality Standards; And To Designate The Existing Sections Of Chapter 49 As Article 1, Entitled "general Provisions".
Title
Recovery Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2024-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-07 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-24 |
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |