SC S0461 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For Funding For The Administration And Implementation Of The Model Recycling Program.
Title
Alcohol permit for consumption on premises
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Cleary [R] | Sen. Robert Ford [D] | Sen. Joel Lourie [D] | Sen. Glenn Reese [D] |
Sen. John Scott [D] | Sen. Vincent Sheheen [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-06-02 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-05-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-05-24 | Roll call Ayes-31 Nays-9 | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time | |
2011-05-24 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2011-02-04 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Nicholson | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3624 (Similar To) 2011-02-08 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 4 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 2 | 85 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
61 | 2 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |