SC S0504 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Problem And To Declare Tuesday, April 9, 2013, As "children's Advocacy Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Children's Advocacy Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |
Same As/Similar To
H3786 (Similar To) 2013-03-19 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0504&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/504_20130307.htm |