SC S0621 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide For Certain Notice Requirements Before The Bonds May Be Issued

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 53
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 73
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-28SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-27SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2019-03-27SenateRead second time
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4211 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4143100(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback