SC S0654 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidate Barnwell School District 45, Barnwell County Consolidated School District, And Barnwell County School District 80 Into One School District To Be Known As The Barnwell County School District; To Abolish Barnwell County School District 45, Barnwell County Consolidated School District, And Barnwell County School District 80 On July 1, 2024; To Provide That The Barnwell County School District Must Be Governed By A Board Of Trustees Consisting Of Five Members, Which Initially Must Be Appointed By The Barnwell County Legislative Delegation, And Beginning With The 2024 General Election, Each Of The Five Members Of The Barnwell County School District Must Be Elected From Single-member Election Districts As Delineated On A Designated Map Number On File With The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office; To Provide That The Members Of The Barnwell County School District Board Of Trustees Must Be Elected In Nonpartisan Elections Conducted At The Same Time As The 2024 General Election And Every Four Years Thereafter, Except As Provided In This Act To Stagger The Members' Terms; To Provide Demographic Information For The Newly Drawn Election Districts; To Establish The Board's Powers, Duties, And Responsibilities; To Provide That The District Superintendent Is The Chief Operating Officer Of The District And Is Responsible To The Board For The Proper Administration Of All Affairs Of The District And Subject To All Other Provisions Of Law Relating To His Duties; To Include Interim Millage Provisions For Years 2024 And 2025; And To Provide That Beginning In 2026, The Barnwell County School District Shall Have Total Fiscal Autonomy. - Ratified Title
Title
Barnwell County School Districts, consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-06 | Act No. 92 | |
2023-04-27 | Effective date 04/25/23 | |
2023-04-25 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-04-19 | Ratified R 11 | |
2023-04-06 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2023-04-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2023-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-04 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Barnwell Delegation |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Barnwell Delegation |
2023-03-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |