SC S0719 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Privileges And Immunities Of Citizens Of This State To Born And Preborn Persons Beginning At Conception.
Title
Abortion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-24 Nays-16 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Motion For Special Order Failed |
2016-04-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Bright (ch), Corbin, M.B.Matthews |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4093 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Limehouse, Quinn