SC S0845 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 62-3-108, Relating To Probate, Testacy, And Appointment Proceedings; Ultimate Time Limit, So As To Allow Appropriate Appointment Proceedings For An Estate Of An Individual Regardless Of The Date Of Death, To Allow Appointment Proceedings For The Purpose Of Allowing A Claim Pursuant To The "honoring Our Pact Act Of 2022".
Title
Probate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-04-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2024-04-25 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-02-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Reichenbach, Devine |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0850 (Similar To) 2024-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Reichenbach, Devine
S0869 (Similar To) 2024-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Reichenbach, Devine
H4559 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0869 (Similar To) 2024-01-19 - Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Reichenbach, Devine
H4559 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary