SC S0980 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act No. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act No. 274
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Operation Of A Related Grants Program By The South Carolina Animal Care And Control Association Or Its Successor, To Require The Department Of Agriculture Shall Provide An Annual Accounting And Summary Of This Program To The General Assembly, And To Provide Local Nonprofit Spaying And Neutering Programs Must Provide Certain Information To The Association Before They May Receive Reimbursements For Services From The Fund, And To Provide The Association Shall Provide The Department With Certain Information About The Number Of Individuals Who Bring In Animals For Spaying Or Neutering And The Number Of Animals Brought In By Each Of These Individuals; And To Create The Pet Care And Humane Treatment Study Committee, And To Provide The Purposes, Duties, Composition, And Reporting Requirements Of The Committee
Title
Veterinarians and prescription drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - House - House: Override Veto (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Act No. 274 | |
2016-06-21 | Effective date 06/15/16 | |
2016-06-15 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-92 Nays-3 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Veto overridden by originating body Ayes-37 Nays-4 |
2016-06-08 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 231 | |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-4 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2016-06-02 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-8 |
2016-06-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-06-01 | House | Amended |
2016-05-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 69 | 295 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 69 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 69 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 9600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |