SC S1027 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Act No. 239
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Act No. 239
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 50-11-770 SO AS TO ENACT THE "RENEGADE HUNTER ACT", TO PROVIDE IT IS UNLAWFUL FOR A PERSON TO HUNT FROM A ROAD, RIGHT OF WAY, PROPERTY LINE, BOUNDARY, OR PROPERTY UPON WHICH HE DOES NOT HAVE HUNTING RIGHTS WITH THE AID OR USE OF A DOG WHEN THE DOG HAS ENTERED UPON THE LAND OF ANOTHER WITHOUT WRITTEN PERMISSION OR OVER WHICH THE PERSON DOES NOT HAVE HUNTING RIGHTS, TO PROVIDE THE PROVISIONS OF THIS SECTION APPLY WHETHER THE PERSON IN CONTROL OF THE DOG INTENTIONALLY OR UNINTENTIONALLY RELEASES, ALLOWS, OR OTHERWISE CAUSES THE DOG TO ENTER UPON THE LAND OF ANOTHER WITHOUT PERMISSION OF THE LANDOWNER, TO PROVIDE CERTAIN DEFINITIONS, TO PROVIDE EXCEPTIONS, AND TO PROVIDE PENALTIES. - ratified title
Title
Enact The "renegade Hunter Act", To Provide It Is Unlawful For A Person To Hunt From A Road, Right Of Way, Property Line, Boundary, Or Property Upon Which He Does Not Have Hunting Rights With The Aid Or Use Of A Dog When The Dog Has Entered Upon The Land Of Another Without Written Permission Or Over Which The Person Does Not Have Hunting Rights, To Provide The Provisions Of This Section Apply Whether The Person In Control Of The Dog Intentionally Or Unintentionally Releases, Allows, Or Otherwise Causes The Dog To Enter Upon The Land Of Another Without Permission Of The Landowner, To Provide Certain Definitions, To Provide Exceptions, And To Provide Penalties. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
Sen. John McGill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Act No. 239 | |
2010-06-28 | Effective date 06/11/10 | |
2010-06-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 306 | |
2010-06-03 | Ordered enrolled for ratification SJ-44 | |
2010-06-02 | Conference report received and adopted HJ-73 | |
2010-06-02 | Conference report received and adopted SJ-170 | |
2010-06-01 | Conference committee appointed McGill, Cromer, and Campbell SJ-91 | |
2010-06-01 | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Hiott, Umphlett, and Knight HJ-6 | |
2010-05-27 | Non-concurrence in House amendment SJ-81 | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-63 | |
2010-05-25 | Roll call Yeas-75 Nays-21 HJ-159 | |
2010-05-25 | Read second time HJ-159 | |
2010-05-25 | Amended HJ-159 | |
2010-05-19 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-1 | |
2010-05-12 | Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-39 | |
2010-04-27 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 4, 2010 HJ-83 | |
2010-04-13 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Hiott, Umphlett, Parker, Allison, Forrester, Kelly, Rice, Loftis, Littlejohn, Cole, Skelton, R. Brown, Gilliard, Duncan, Toole, Frye, Spires, and Hart HJ-46 | |
2010-03-10 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, April 13, 2010 HJ-22 | |
2010-03-09 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-3 | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs HJ-4 | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced and read first time HJ-4 | |
2010-01-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-01-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-01-14 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-10 | |
2010-01-14 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-10 | |
2010-01-13 | Read second time SJ-14 | |
2010-01-13 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-14 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry SJ-60 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time SJ-60 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1027&session=118 |