SC S1046 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 516
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 2-19-10, Relating To Judicial Merit Selection Commission, Appointment, Qualifications, And Terms, So As To Provide For The Appointment Of Judicial Merit Selection Commission Members, Initial Terms, And Subsequent Terms, To Amend The Membership Of The Commission, To Provide That, Except Those First Appointed, The Members Appointed By The Senate President, The Senate Judiciary Chairman, The Speaker Of The House, And The House Judiciary Chairman Shall Serve An Initial Term Of Two Years, And To Provide That No Nominee May Be A Family Member Of A Current Member Of The Judicial Merit Selection Commission; By Adding Section 2-19-15 So As To Provide For The Appointment Of An Executive Director And Professional Staff; By Amending Section 2-19-20, Relating To Investigation By Commission And Publication Of Vacancies, So As To Provide The Criteria For The Qualification Of Judicial Candidates; By Amending Section 2-19-30, Relating To Hearings And Executive Session, So As To Require All Public Hearings Be Live Streamed; By Amending Section 2-19-70, Relating To The Prohibition Against Dual Offices, Privileges Of The Floor, And Pledges, So As To Provide For Certain Floor Privileges And Prohibitions For Candidates And Establishing Set Times For The Release Of Reports And The Seeking Of Pledges And To Provide That The Formal Release Of The Report Of Qualifications Shall Occur No Earlier Than Twelve Days After Nominees Have Been Released To Members Of The General Assembly; By Amending Section 2-19-80, Relating To Nomination Of Qualified Candidates To The General Assembly, So As To Provide That All Qualified Candidates Shall Be Released To The General Assembly; By Amending Section 2-19-90, Relating To The Approval Of The General Assembly In Joint Session, So As To Provide That A Candidate Must Receive A Majority Vote Of Each House; And By Amending Section 22-1-10, Relating To Appointment, Terms And Territorial Jurisdiction, Training, And Certification Or Recertification Requirements, So As To Provide That The Governor Shall Receive Recommendations From The Full Legislative Delegation Of The County The Magistrate Will Serve.
Title
Judicial Merit Selection Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-03-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2024-03-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Debate interrupted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-31 Nays-11 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Special order, set for February 28, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |