SC S1076 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act No. 150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act No. 150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish That An Individual Does Not Need To Apply For A Permit To Dredge A Manmade, Predominately Armored, Recreational Use Or Essential Access Canal
Title
Permit maintenance dredging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Act No. 150 | |
2016-04-27 | Effective date 04/21/16 | |
2016-04-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-04-19 | Ratified R 155 | |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Amended |
2016-02-25 | House | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |