SC S1131 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Act No. 161
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Act No. 161
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 4-29-67, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS REQUIRING A FEE IN LIEU OF PROPERTY TAXES AGREEMENT, SO AS TO ADD CERTAIN DEFINITIONS, TO FURTHER PROVIDE FOR THE MINIMUM LEVEL OF INVESTMENT FOR A QUALIFIED NUCLEAR PLANT FACILITY, TO PROVIDE FOR THE TIMELINE WHEN THE SPONSOR MUST ENTER INTO AN INITIAL LEASE AGREEMENT WITH THE COUNTY IN REGARD TO A QUALIFIED NUCLEAR PLANT FACILITY, AND THE TIMELINES WHEN THE SPONSOR MUST MEET MINIMUM INVESTMENT REQUIREMENTS IN THE CASE OF A QUALIFIED NUCLEAR PLANT FACILITY AND PLACE THE PROJECT INTO SERVICE; TO AMEND SECTION 12-44-30, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO DEFINITIONS IN REGARD TO THE FEE IN LIEU OF TAX SIMPLIFICATION ACT, SO AS TO REVISE CERTAIN DEFINITIONS AND ADD CERTAIN DEFINITIONS; AND TO AMEND SECTION 12-44-40, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE REQUIRED FEE AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE SPONSOR AND THE COUNTY UNDER THE FEE IN LIEU OF TAX SIMPLIFICATION ACT, SO AS TO PROVIDE THE TIME WITHIN WHICH A SPONSOR HAS TO ENTER INTO A FEE AGREEMENT IN REGARD TO A QUALIFIED NUCLEAR PLANT FACILITY. - ratified title
Title
Provide The Time Within Which A Sponsor Has To Enter Into A Fee Agreement In Regard To A Qualified Nuclear Plant Facility. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Act No. 161 | |
2010-05-21 | Effective date 05/12/10 | |
2010-05-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Ratified R 188 | |
2010-05-05 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-10 | |
2010-05-04 | Read second time HJ-36 | |
2010-04-27 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 4, 2010 HJ-50 | |
2010-04-23 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, April 27, 2010 HJ-34 | |
2010-04-15 | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means HJ-16 | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-36 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced and read first time HJ-36 | |
2010-03-02 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-27 | |
2010-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-18 | Read second time SJ-6 | |
2010-02-17 | Committee report: Favorable Finance SJ-15 | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-6 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H4545 (Similar To) 2010-02-16 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-5
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 44 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 44 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 29 | 67 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1131&session=118 |