SC S1166 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Executive Director Of The State Fiscal Accountability Authority To Enter Into A Loan Repayment Agreement On Outstanding Loans With South Carolina State University, To Provide That If The University Meets Certain Standards That Portions Of The Loan Must Be Forgiven, To Provide Processes To Aid The Financial Structure Of The University, To Provide Reporting Requirements, And To Extend Flexibility Related To Furlough Programs
Title
SC State University
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table (Y: 21 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table (Y: 21 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 286 | |
2016-06-16 | Effective date 07/02/16 | |
2016-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 240 | |
2016-06-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-2 |
2016-06-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-27 Nays-13 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2016-05-25 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-05-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-24 |
2016-05-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-24 | House | Amended |
2016-05-19 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-25-16 |
2016-05-18 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-25 Nays-19 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |