SC S1233 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 215 In Fairfield County From Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 34 To Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 213 "elder Richard Brown Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers At This Location Containing These Words.
Title
Elder Richard Brown Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2024-04-30 | House | Introduced |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced |