SC S1266 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read third time and enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read third time and enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Workers' Compensation Commission, Relating To Payment Of Compensation, Designated As Regulation Document Number 5266, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The South Carolina Code Of Laws.
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - JR to Approve Regulation Doc No. 5266
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2024-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-25 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |