SC S1337 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 300
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 300
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reapportion The Specific Election Districts From Which Members Of The Governing Body Of The Florence County School District No. 1 Must Be Elected Beginning With School Trustee Elections In 2012, And To Provide For Demographic Information In Regard To These Newly Drawn Election Districts
Title
Florence County School District No. 1 Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 300 | |
2012-04-04 | Effective date 04/02/12 | |
2012-04-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Ratified R 152 | |
2012-03-29 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-03-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-03-28 | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-28 | Read second time | |
2012-03-27 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference | |
2012-03-20 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-03-15 | Read second time | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |