SC S1403 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-64
Status: Introduced on April 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-64
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO REQUEST THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION NAME THE INTERSECTION OF ORANGEBURG ROAD AND CENTRAL AVENUE IN DORCHESTER COUNTY AS "KNIGHT CROSSROADS" AND ERECT APPROPRIATE MARKERS OR SIGNS AT THIS INTERSECTION THAT CONTAIN THE WORDS "KNIGHT CROSSROADS".
Title
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Of Orangeburg Road And Central Avenue In Dorchester County As "knight Crossroads" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection That Contain The Words "knight Crossroads".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-64 | |
2010-05-25 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, May 26, 2010 HJ-120 | |
2010-05-12 | Debate adjourned until Thursday, May 13, 2010 HJ-38 | |
2010-05-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-06 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-11 | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-25 | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced HJ-25 | |
2010-04-29 | Adopted, sent to House SJ-42 | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference SJ-15 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1403&session=118 |