SC S1478 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-72
Status: Introduced on May 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-72
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION CALLING UPON THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL AND THE DEPARTMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES, IN COORDINATION WITH THE GOVERNOR, TO IMMEDIATELY BEGIN DEVELOPING A CONTINGENCY PLAN IN THE EVENT THE OIL LEAKING FROM THE DEEPWATER HORIZON IN THE GULF OF MEXICO IS SWEPT BY CURRENTS UP THE SOUTHEASTERN SEABOARD; IN DEVELOPING THIS PLAN THEY SHOULD ASSESS THE ACTIONS BEING TAKEN TO COMBAT THIS CRISIS AND DETERMINE WHAT SOLUTIONS ARE SUCCESSFUL AND WHAT ARE NOT AND IDENTIFY THE BEST PRACTICES AVAILABLE TO ADDRESS THIS PROBLEM AND THE RESOURCES NECESSARY TO CARRY OUT THIS PLAN.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution Calling Upon The Department Of Health And Environmental Control And The Department Of Natural Resources, In Coordination With The Governor, To Immediately Begin Developing A Contingency Plan In The Event The Oil Leaking From The Deepwater Horizon In The Gulf Of Mexico Is Swept By Currents Up The Southeastern Seaboard; In Developing This Plan They Should Assess The Actions Being Taken To Combat This Crisis And Determine What Solutions Are Successful And What Are Not And Identify The Best Practices Available To Address This Problem And The Resources Necessary To Carry Out This Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence HJ-72 | |
2010-06-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-06-01 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-112 | |
2010-06-01 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-12 | |
2010-06-01 | Introduced HJ-12 | |
2010-05-26 | Introduced, adopted, sent to House SJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H5043 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources SJ-9
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1478&session=118 |