SC S1492 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 294
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That If The Boundary Line Between Two School Districts In Anderson County Bisects A Parcel Of Real Property On Which A Home Is Located That Constitutes The Principal Residence Of School-aged Children Living Therein As Well As Their Parents Or Legal Guardians, Or, In The Alternative, Bisects An Adjoining Parcel Or Parcels Owned By The Parents Or Legal Guardians Or Members Of Their Immediate Family All Of Which Are Contiguous To Each Other, Those Children Are Entitled To Attend The Schools Of Either District Regardless Of The District In Which The Building Itself Constituting The Principal Residence Is Located, And Regardless Of The Amount Of School Operating Or Debt Service Ad Valorem Property Taxes Received By Or Reimbursed To Either District
Title
School District 5
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 294 | |
2012-06-19 | Effective date 06/07/12 | |
2012-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-06-05 | Ratified R 227 | |
2012-05-29 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled | |
2012-05-25 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments | |
2012-05-24 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2012-05-24 | Roll call Yeas-85 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-24 | Read second time | |
2012-05-24 | Amended | |
2012-05-23 | Delegation report: Favorable Anderson Delegation | |
2012-05-08 | Referred to Anderson Delegation | |
2012-05-08 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-05-02 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time | |
2012-04-26 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |