SC S903 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Committed to Committee on Finance SJ-59
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Committed to Committee on Finance SJ-59
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND ACT 200 OF 2002, RELATING TO THE SOUTH CAROLINA CONSERVATION BANK ACT, SO AS TO DELETE A PROVISION WHICH PROVIDES THAT NO FURTHER DEED RECORDING FEES OR OTHER FUNDS MAY BE CREDITED TO THE CONSERVATION BANK TRUST FUND IN ANY YEAR WHEN A MAJORITY OF STATE AGENCY APPROPRIATIONS ARE REDUCED IN THE ANNUAL GENERAL APPROPRIATIONS ACT OR WHEN THE STATE BUDGET AND CONTROL BOARD IMPOSES ACROSS THE BOARD CUTS AND INSTEAD PROVIDE FOR A REDUCTION ON A PERCENTAGE BASIS IN THE AMOUNT OF DEED RECORDING FEES WHICH MAY BE TRANSFERRED TO THE TRUST FUND, AND TO EXTEND THE EXPIRATION DATE OF THE PROVISIONS OF LAW RELATING TO THE CONSERVATION BANK ACT AND OTHER RELATED DATES PERTAINING TO THE CLOSURE OF THE CONSERVATION BANK ACT AND CONSERVATION BANK FUND.
Title
Delete A Provision Which Provides That No Further Deed Recording Fees Or Other Funds May Be Credited To The Conservation Bank Trust Fund In Any Year When A Majority Of State Agency Appropriations Are Reduced In The Annual General Appropriations Act Or When The State Budget And Control Board Imposes Across The Board Cuts And Instead Provide For A Reduction On A Percentage Basis In The Amount Of Deed Recording Fees Which May Be Transferred To The Trust Fund, And To Extend The Expiration Date Of The Provisions Of Law Relating To The Conservation Bank Act And Other Related Dates Pertaining To The Closure Of The Conservation Bank Act And Conservation Bank Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Committed to Committee on Finance SJ-59 | |
2010-03-10 | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources SJ-12 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources SJ-12 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time SJ-12 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2009-12-09 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4269 (Similar To) 2010-05-04 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-12
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=0903&session=118 |