SD HB1006 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Signed by the Governor on February 1, 2017 H.J. 264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Signed by the Governor on February 1, 2017 H.J. 264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain requirements for a public notice of a public meeting.
Title
Revise certain requirements for a public notice of a public meeting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 1, 2017 H.J. 264 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2017 H.J. 236 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 226 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 203 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 183 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 160 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 124 |
2017-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 71 |
2017-01-13 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-01-13 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 48 |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 18 |