SD HB1010 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of bulk pesticide.
Title
Revise the definition of bulk pesticide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Signed by Governor H.J. 438 | |
2011-02-15 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 404 | |
2011-02-14 | Signed by President S.J. 423 | |
2011-02-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 359 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 377 | |
2011-02-08 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 353 | |
2011-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 227 | |
2011-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 187 | |
2011-01-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 162 | |
2011-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 23 |