SD HB1012 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the students eligible for resident tuition benefits at universities controlled by the Board of Regents.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the students eligible for resident tuition benefits at universities controlled by the Board of Regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 348 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 345 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 350 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 316 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 307 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 287 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 180 |
2013-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 118 |
2013-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 118 Amendment 1012ra |
2013-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 103 |
2013-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 85 |
2013-01-11 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 56 |
2013-01-11 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1012oa |
2013-01-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 22 |