SD HB1012 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 338
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 338
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding child welfare agencies.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding child welfare agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 338 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 333 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 309 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 298 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 267 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 244 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 192 |
2015-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 164 |
2015-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 128 |
2015-01-22 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 78 |
2015-01-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 37 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 24 |