SD HB1015 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 412
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 412
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the imposition of the five dollar surcharge on mentored youth big game hunting licenses.
Title
Repeal the imposition of the five dollar surcharge on mentored youth big game hunting licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | Signed by Governor H.J. 412 | |
2010-02-16 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 409 | |
2010-02-12 | Signed by President S.J. 322 | |
2010-02-11 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 375 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 280 | |
2010-02-04 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 252 | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 172 | |
2010-01-27 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 200 | |
2010-01-26 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 172 | |
2010-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 21 |