SD HB1020 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding state building committees for capital improvement projects.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding state building committees for capital improvement projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 H.J. 366 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 336 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 346 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 302 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 276 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 214 |
2019-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 222 |
2019-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 209 |
2019-01-24 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 172 |
2019-01-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 156 |
2019-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 20 |