SD HB1025 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Signed by Governor H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make aggravated incest a violent crime for purposes of setting an initial parole date.
Title
Make aggravated incest a violent crime for purposes of setting an initial parole date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Signed by Governor H.J. 352 | |
2012-02-02 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 307 | |
2012-02-01 | Signed by President S.J. 250 | |
2012-01-31 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 267 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 217 | |
2012-01-26 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-26 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 188 | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 136 | |
2012-01-20 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 76 | |
2012-01-13 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 50 | |
2012-01-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 20 |