SD HB1028 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding trust companies.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding trust companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass, Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary Do Pass, Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - Judiciary Do Pass, Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary Do Pass, Passed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - Judiciary Do Pass, Passed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2018 H.J. 596 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 588 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 565 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 531 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 497 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary, Passed S.J. 172 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 159 |
2018-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 93 |
2018-01-17 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-17 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 72 |
2018-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 22 |