SD HB1032 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the money, clothing, and transportation furnished inmates released from the Department of Corrections.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the money, clothing, and transportation furnished inmates released from the Department of Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 348 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 316 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 318 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 277 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 278 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 258 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 181 |
2013-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 116 |
2013-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 103 |
2013-01-16 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 80 |
2013-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 26 |